+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Families
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 145
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time