+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor