+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 16, 2:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 127 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Laid Over - Third Reading
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time