+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - No Action Taken
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor