+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
4202H02.03H
Distributed