+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (19)
4072H04.25H
Distributed
4072H04.04H
Distributed
4072H04.24H
Distributed
4072H04.23H
Distributed
4072H04.18H
Distributed
4072H04.20H
Distributed
4072H04.16H
Distributed
4072H04.17H
Distributed
4072H04.13L
Distributed
4072H04.12H
Distributed
4072H04.12L
Distributed
4072H04.11L
Distributed
4072H04.10L
Distributed
4072H04.09L
Distributed
4072H04.08L
Distributed
4072H04.04L
Distributed
4072H04.07H
Distributed
4072H04.03L
Distributed
4072H04.02L
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor