+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 134 NOES: 13
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee: General Laws
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time