+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor