+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor