+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time