+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time