+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 6, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 00
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 2, 2:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 001
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time