+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Urban Issues
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor