+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 25, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 3
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Small Business, Insurance & Indust Rel
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
- HCS Adopted
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Financial Services
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor