+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Senior Security
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor