+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 3, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor