+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor