+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Homeland Security and Veterans Affairs
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor