+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Retirement
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time