+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 6, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor