+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Higher Education
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor