+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 14, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2004 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 155 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 156 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 159 NOES: 0
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled
On March 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 156 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 158 NOES: 0
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor