+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - NO ACTION TAKEN
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time