+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor