+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled