+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, APRIL 22, 2010 9:00 AM, SCR 2
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2009 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor