+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 7, 2010, 12:00P.M., SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources
On March 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 0
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected - AYES: 88 NOES: 66 PRESENT: 0
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Rural Community Development
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2009 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor