+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- Laid Over - HSA 1 FOR HA 1 ADOPTED
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Laid Over
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time