+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On July 14, 2017 in the House:
- Gov Took no Action, Sent to Sec of State/Article 3 Sec 31
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
- Constitutional Objection Filed
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS#2
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken Up
- SS Withdrawn
- Senate Substitute Offered
- SS Adopted - AYES: 23 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 23 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 23 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- House Adopts - SS#2 AYES: 108 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 0
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 109 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 0
- Emergency Clause Defeated on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 108 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 0
- House Message
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken Up
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 12:00pm,SCR 2
- Second read and referred: Senate Local Government and Elections
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 109 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 112 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Laid Over
- Taken Up
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
- Taken Up
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- HCS Adopted - AYES: 109 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 0
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Read Second Time
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (20)
2328H02.35H
Distributed
2328H02.29H
Distributed
2328H02.33H
Distributed
2328H02.32H
Adopted
2328H02.34H
Distributed
2328H02.19H
Distributed
2328H02.31H
Distributed
2328H02.26H
Distributed
2328H02.23H
Defeated
2328H02.14H
Distributed
2328H02.25H
Distributed
2328H02.20H
Distributed
2328H02.21H
Distributed
2328H02.28H
Withdrawn
2328H02.11H
Distributed
2328H02.08H
Distributed
2328H02.07H
Distributed
2328H02.27H
Distributed
2328H02.05H
Distributed
2328H02.12H
Distributed