+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Tourism and Cultural Affairs
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time