+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 28, 2005 in the House:
- Prefiled