+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 0
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On January 9, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time