+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 00
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 00
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SS Withdrawn
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SS PENDING
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Laid Over - SCS,SS/SCS, SA 1/SSA 1 FOR SA AND SA 2/SSA/SA 1 PENDING
On April 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar - WITH SCS, SS, SA 1/SSA 1/SA 1 PENDING
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MARCH 21, 2012, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 000
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 147 NOES: 000
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 9, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor