+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings
- Read Second Time
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
2537L01.02H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor