+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor