+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- Motion to Do Pass Failed
- Executive Session Completed
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time