+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 9, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor