+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 9, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time