+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Retirement
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 16, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor