+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time