+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 6, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
4676L01.02H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor