+ − Actions (41)
On May 17, 2002 in the House:
- Laid Over
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES RIZZO, SCHEVE, SMITH, HANAWAY AND KELLEY
On May 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS KENNEY, STEELMAN, KLARICH, GOODE AND QUICK
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
On May 17, 2002 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 16, 2002 in the Senate:
- SS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1,SA 2,SA 3,SA 7,SA 8,SA 10,SA 11,SA 12,SA 13, SA 16,SA 17,SA 21,SA 22,SA 23,SA 24,SA 25,SA 26, SA 27,SA 28 ADOPTED YEAS: 26 NAYS: 5
On May 16, 2002 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS SCS AS AMENDED
On May 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 7, SA 8 ADOPTED/SCS AND SS/ SCS PENDING
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred: Budget Control Committee
On May 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On May 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Commerce and Environment
On April 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 25, 2002 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 113 NOES: 36
On April 23, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review and Government Reform
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
On April 16, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Calendar
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4 ADOPTED/HCS AS AMENDED PENDING
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4 ADOPTED
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On January 31, 2002 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On January 22, 2002 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Commerce and Economic Development
On January 10, 2002 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 5, 2001 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor