+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Families
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 135 NOES: 010
On April 24, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 5, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor