+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Referred: General Laws
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 6, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
4620L01.02H
Distributed
4620L01.03H
Distributed