+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Voted Do Pass
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 2, 2019, 9:45am, Pershing Gallery-Amended
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Monday, April 29, 2019, 2 p.m., SCR 2
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 135 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor