+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 4, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor