+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - No Action Taken
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Referred: General Laws
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 3, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
4675L02.01L
Distributed
4675L02.03H
Distributed