+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on General Laws
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 14, 2005 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor