+ − Actions (15)
On April 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Public Health and Welfare
On March 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 6, 2001 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 001
On March 5, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
- Perfected by Consent
On February 8, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On January 30, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 23, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Children, Families, and Health
On January 4, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 8, 2000 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor