+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, MAY 1, 1:30PM, SCR 1
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: General Laws
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 115 NOES: 031
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 5, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2012 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 21, 2011 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor